THE BOBATH CENTRE FOR CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a treatment service delivering specialist Bobath Therapy to aid those with cerebral palsy. We also provide training in the Bobath Concept to therapists, doctors and others working with clients who have cerebral palsy and advanced courses for Bobath qualified therapists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income:
£606,566
Donations and legacies | £212.21k | |
Charitable activities | £191.05k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £457 | |
Other | £202.85k |
Total expenditure:
£1,060,484
Raising funds | £117.25k | |
Charitable activities | £740.39k | |
Other | £202.85k |
£18,278 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £32,648 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £320.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £740.39k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- BOBATH CHILDREN (Working name)
- BOBATH CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE WESTERN CEREBRAL PALSY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £553.17k | £1.48m | £1.36m | £1.08m | £606.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04m | £2.73m | £1.68m | £1.50m | £1.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £107.64k | £32.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £66.41k | £138.03k | £89.27k | £261.65k | £212.21k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £53.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £406.56k | £417.05k | £256.09k | £46.34k | £191.05k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.55k | £2.46k | £9.11k | £2.69k | £457 | |
|
Income - Other | £25.64k | £924.89k | £1.01m | £768.99k | £202.85k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £33.30k | £10.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £917.27k | £2.52m | £752.11k | £679.03k | £740.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £118.69k | £215.15k | £52.08k | £66.37k | £117.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.00k | £12.60k | £16.86k | £18.99k | £30.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £875.89k | £750.85k | £202.85k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.34m | £729.72k | £701.88k | £677.97k | £639.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £518.28k | |
|
Other assets | £818.95k | £2.57m | £2.09m | £1.63m | £743.23k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£79.08k | -£23.56k | -£22.74k | -£18.08k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £900.95k | £345.08k | £178.83k | £114.17k | £144.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2019
(These accounts |
31 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1957 AS AMENDED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1965, 2ND MARCH 1993 AND 16TH DECEMBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TREATMENT FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY. TRAINING FACILITIES FOR PHYSIOTHERAPISTS, SPEECH THERAPISTS AND OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS FROM GREAT BRITAIN AND ABROAD WHO WISH TO SPECIALISE IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF SPASTICS. RESEARCH INTO EARLY RECOGNITION, EFFECTS AND TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL PALSY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window