PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT FRIENDLY SOCIETIES' HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides accommodation/housing for independent elderly/older people in need and living within 15 miles of Portsmouth Guildhall, for a minimum of 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 15 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Dowling | Chair | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Kille | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Stephen Mark Christopher Pitt | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Cllr Cal Corkery | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLLR VERNON-JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.48k | £81.06k | £85.51k | £86.79k | £101.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.16k | £54.29k | £67.00k | £86.57k | £94.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15TH OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN AREA OF BENEFIT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE MEMBERS OF FRIENDLY SOCIETIES AND THEIR WIDOWS.
Area of benefit
AREA WITHIN 15 MILE RADIUS FROM THE GUILDHALL,PORTSMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portsmouth Rotary Housing
2A Ruskin Road
SOUTHSEA
Hampshire
PO4 8RQ
- Phone:
- 02392 754 791
- Email:
- enquiries@prha.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window