AGE CONCERN ST ALBANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hall for activities in central St Albans including two weekly day centres, and hire for age-related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Woods | Chair | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harris | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Almond | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.92k | £31.96k | £24.65k | £21.02k | £27.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.63k | £38.37k | £37.93k | £22.57k | £32.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 3 JULY 1984, 4TH FEBRUARY 1986 AND 3 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AN AROUND THE CITY AND DISTRICT OF ST ALBANS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
CITY AND DISTRICT OF ST ALBANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WELFARE CENTRE
1A HALL PLACE CLOSE
ST. ALBANS
AL1 3SD
- Phone:
- 01727856741
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window