WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MILFORD-ON-SEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
craft, drama, play-reading, skittles, walks, table tennis, outings, produce group, book club, Some members. help provide a monthly Sunday lunch and also help in the village Pop-In on a Thursday. Cakes for Macmillan Coffee morning. Large entry at New Forest Show. Hats etc knitted for Samaritans Purse Shoeboxes. Strong support for village Community Centre. Christmas entertainment for members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- WOMENS INSTITUTE - MILFORD-ON-SEA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances O'Donoghue | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Hope | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Byrne | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Haigh | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Howells | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Dawn Moreton | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Evans | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Dawn Snelgar | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Haupt | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Cobbett | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.95k | £4.70k | £6.19k | £11.85k | £10.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £3.28k | £9.69k | £10.96k | £11.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
MILFORD-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Plover Drive
Milford on Sea
Milford on Sea
Lymington
- Phone:
- 07780 437748
- Email:
- lindambyrne19@gmail.com
- Website:
-
milfordonseawi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window