HAMMER VALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 229797
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Total income: £597
Total expenditure: £1,823
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Hampshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- 11 September 2012: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - HAMMERVALE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £1.02k | £2.68k | £991 | £597 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £2.91k | £2.42k | £2.28k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 07 September 2011 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 30 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 18 August 2009 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTON AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRAMSHOTT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window