RINGWOOD AND HANGERSLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLD EDUCATIONAL EVENINGS - WITH SPEAKERS AND VARIOUS DEMONSTRATIONS AND ATTEND WI EDUCATIONAL DAYS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- R AND H W I (Working name)
- RINGWOOD AND HANGERSLEY WI (Working name)
- WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - HANGERSLEY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA KITCHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Walsh | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £807 | £457 | £221 | £2.09k | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £704 | £221 | £421 | £2.22k | £860 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES.
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
HANGERSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Parsonage Barn Lane
Ringwood
BH24 1PS
- Phone:
- 01425478336
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window