SALISBURY AND DISTRICT NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the society are:- 1. To compile lists of the flora and fauna of the district, 2. To study the natural history, culture and history of the district, 3. To make a photographic record of the district, 4. To promote the conservation of the flora and fauna of the district. The society arranges lectures and field meetings, and publishes a monthly bulletin of its findings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gordon Thompson | Chair | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Pearl Ashton | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Paige Scott | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Thomas Elsworth | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Gratwick | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Royle | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Hardingham | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lea | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES NEIL MACPHERSON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MUGGLETON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £553 | £1.37k | £1.78k | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £759 | £1.61k | £2.11k | £3.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE SOCIETY AS AMENDED 18TH NOVEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
A) TO COMPILE LISTS OF THE FLORA AND FAUNA OF THE DISTRICT B) TO STUDY THE NATURAL HISTORY, CULTURE AND HISTORY OF THE DISTRICT C) TO MAKE A PHOTOGRAPHIC RECORD OF THE DISTRICT AND D) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE FLORA AND FAUNA OF THE DISTRICT
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 WAIN-A-LONG ROAD
SALISBURY
SP1 1LW
- Phone:
- 01722327486
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window