THE BINGHAM HALL

Charity number: 229845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide a hall for community and public use and provide rental housing stock

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £266,609
Total expenditure: £239,244

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 06 April 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith WINMILL Chair 13 December 2007
THE FRIENDS OF RENDCOMB COLLEGE
Received: On time
Andy WEBB Trustee 11 September 2023
None on record
Sally HARRISON Trustee 22 January 2018
None on record
Andrew Philip BROWN Trustee 01 March 2017
THE CIRENCESTER COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD.
Received: 6 days late
DAVID DUNN Trustee 05 January 2016
POULTON CRICKET CLUB
Received: 25 days late
Emma Jane BRERETON Trustee 01 February 2015
None on record
James Walter Christopher BEAMAN Trustee 01 February 2015
None on record
Anthony Richard FRANCIS Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
Judith PARIS Trustee 14 February 2014
None on record
Peter John HOOPER Trustee 28 June 2012
None on record
Jennifer Denise JARVIS Trustee 24 June 2008
None on record
Roy BOWYER Trustee 12 March 2006
None on record
Peter ROWE Trustee 30 June 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £242.58k £220.98k £212.31k £244.70k £266.61k
Total expenditure £222.73k £177.77k £158.44k £181.46k £239.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.33k £10.12k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 16.03.1907
Charitable objects
A RIFLE RANGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CIRENCESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
CIRENCESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES
Registration history
  • 13 October 1964 : Standard registration
  • 06 April 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Bingham Hall
King Street
Cirencester
GLOS
GL7 1JT
Phone:
01285 653313