Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S PADDINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 229849
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 25 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 16 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 16 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 01 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 29 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 18 November 2004 On Time