Trustees THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 229907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SANDRA MARY O'SHEA Trustee 01 May 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Dr Adrian John Howkins Trustee 01 May 2025
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Caroline Julie Jowett-Ive Trustee 01 May 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE STOKE BISHOP
Received: On time
Benjamin Hugh Silvey Trustee 01 May 2025
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN MAGGS Trustee 01 May 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Gene Austin Joyner Trustee 01 May 2025
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
The Venerable Rebecca Ann Waring Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Canon Edward Buchan Trustee 01 February 2018
WILTSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW STREET Trustee 23 October 2014
PRODIGAL ARTS
Received: On time
KNOWLE WEST BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
FEEDING BRISTOL
Received: On time
COMMUNITY INITIATIVES SOUTH WEST LIMITED
Received: On time
BRISTOL INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
SIXTY-ONE
Received: On time
SPEAR BRISTOL
Received: On time
TURNAROUND BRISTOL
Recently registered
Reverend Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Trustee 20 April 2013
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE
Received: On time
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
COLIN HAVILL Trustee 12 January 2012
THE BURDEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONG ASHTON
Received: On time