THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS FOR UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitable Trusts for University Hospitals Bristol is a dormant charity since it transferred its assets and liabilities to Above & Beyond (charity number 1170973) on 1 October 2018. Above & Beyond changed its name to University Hospitals Bristol & Weston Charity on 27th October 2021, with the working name of "Bristol & Weston Hospitals Charity". The charity number remains 1170973.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- ABOVE AND BEYOND CHARITIES (Working name)
- THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS FOR THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE SPECIAL TRUSTEES FOR THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS GENERAL PURPOSES FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Above & Beyond | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GROUP REGISTRATION - SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ABOVE AND BEYOND APPEAL
- BARROW HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL DENTAL HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FUND
- BRISTOL EYE HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL GENERAL HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL HAEMATOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY CENTRE GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL HOMEOPATHIC HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN GENERAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL ROYAL INFIRMARY GENERAL CHARITY
- BRYAN ADAMS MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
- KEYNSHAM HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- ST MICHAELS HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- THE PRIMARY CARE SERVICES GENERAL CHARITY
- THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS (CAPITAL ENDOWMENTS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND.
- THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE UNITED BRISTOL HOSPITALS GENERAL PURPOSES FUND
- THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS BRISTOL GENERAL CHARITY
- 26 September 2005 : Standard registration
- 15 May 2013 : Asset transfer in
Contact information
- Address:
-
Above & Beyond
Whitefriars
Lewins Mead
BRISTOL
BS1 2NT
- Phone:
- 01173700483
- Email:
- info@aboveandbeyond.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window