WILLIAM AND JOHN JONES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust shall apply income for the purpose of relieving in cases of need persons resident in the county of Wrexham, who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm. Services or facilities which are calculated to alleviate the suffering or assist the recovery of such persons in such cases but are not readily available to them from other sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wrexham
Governance
- 28 October 1963: Standard registration
- THE JONES TRUST (Working name)
- WILLIAM AND JONES CONVALESCENT HOMES (Previous name)
- WILLIAM JOHN JONES CONVALESCENT HOMES (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Mason | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Pickering | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR MICHAEL MORRIS | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Ian V Roberts | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ANTHONY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.21k | £32.91k | £38.15k | £34.03k | £34.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.91k | £23.76k | £26.33k | £59.24k | £59.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.47k | £3.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 5TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF WREXHAM WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WREXHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 DEVA WAY
WREXHAM
LL13 9EU
- Phone:
- 01978261684
- Email:
- PATMWILLIAMS@TISCALI.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window