THE BRITISH AIRLINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Applications considered only from current or retired British commercial airline pilots, flight engineers and winchmen and their dependants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 March 1964: Standard registration
- BALPA BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Mavin | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Drake | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hill-Tout | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Fowler | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN ELIZABETH EVANS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN KEEGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.25k | £51.59k | £51.93k | £47.56k | £284.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.55k | £83.54k | £77.46k | £64.85k | £90.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/07/1963 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/09/1965 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/01/1975 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL WANT AMONGST SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS WHO ARE, FOR THE TIME BEING, NEEDY OR DESERVING. NAMELY PERSONS WHO ARE, OR WHO HAVE BEEN, ENGAGED PROFESSIONALLY AS PILOTS, FLIGHT ENGINEERS HELICOPTER WINCHMEN OR NAVIGATORS IN COMMERCIAL AVIATION; THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYEES OF THE ASSOCIATION OR ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES; AND WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND ORPHANS OF ALL SUCH PERSONS AND ANYONE DEPENDENT ON ALL SUCH PERSONS FOR THE ORDINARY NECESSITIES OF LIFE 2. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION THROUGH PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND/OR BURSARIES TO SUCH PERSONS DEFINED ABOVE OR, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, TO ANY OTHER NEEDY OR DESERVING PERSON.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HEATHROW BOULEVARD
1ST FLOOR EAST SUITE
286 BATH ROAD
WEST DRAYTON
UB7 0DQ
- Phone:
- 01202397840
- Email:
- scdaccountancy@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window