WOMEN'S INSTITUTE-CARLTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women in the community meeting place, Tai-chi, Piliates,Yoga, Party Functions,Whist Drives, Craft Classes, Keep Fit, Book Club, Ballet and Darts. Also our hall is used by the village community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 14 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Pickersgill | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Knowles | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deb Taylor | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jan Lowe | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jan Harris | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Walker | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbra Sorrell | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jean Tinkler | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Thornton | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aila Howells | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Tingle | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JUNE VALERIE DICKEN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £26.90k | £21.61k | £5.49k | £7.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.87k | £6.78k | £7.62k | £7.80k | £7.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £20.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
CARLTON, REDMARSHALL
Linked charities
- 14 December 1998 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRS J V DICKEN
50 DUNELM ROAD
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS19 0TS
- Phone:
- 01642603819
- Email:
- june.dicken@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window