THE HANDMAIDS OF MARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the religious and other charitable works of the community of sisters known as the Handmaids of Mary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 November 1963: Standard registration
- THE HANDMAIDS OF MARY (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Maria Jerez | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sister Micaela Olmedo Serratos | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARIA DEL CARMEN LACUNZA MUZQUIZ | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.39k | £55.96k | £87.75k | £71.85k | £96.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.54k | £100.94k | £134.14k | £123.70k | £71.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/7/1963 AND SCHEME DATED 16TH OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CATHOLIC RELIGION AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED OUT IN ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING THE NURSING OF THE SICK.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Convent
2 Atkins Road
Clapham Park
LONDON
SW12 0AB
- Phone:
- 02086731247
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window