Y GANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL ABERGYNOLWYN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES FOR CLUBS AND SOCIETIES IN AND AROUND THE VILLAGE OF ABERGYNOLWYN. CATERING FOR PARTIES, CONCERTS, FUNCTIONS AND CONFERENCES. LEASING COMMUNITY CAFE. SITE OF (SNOWDONIA NATIONAL PARK) TOURIST INFORMATION POINT. SERVING AS LOCAL POLLING STATION AND VENUE EDUCATIONAL CLASSES RUN BY A LOCAL COLLEGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,064 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 03 September 1963: Standard registration
- Y GANOLFAN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Frances anne Cator | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN STANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN LAURENCE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIA WYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CEINWEN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENIONA SARAH PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALINE MARGARET POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.26k | £17.35k | £15.63k | £17.45k | £21.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.98k | £12.36k | £15.35k | £15.27k | £21.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £5.28k | N/A | £1.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
A SOCIAL CENTRE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
ABERGYNOLWYN AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abergynolwyn Community Hall
Abergynolwyn
TYWYN
Gwynedd
LL36 9UU
- Phone:
- 01654 216234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window