CARR'S COTTAGE AND CARR'S BETHEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting of Alms House
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 31 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND SUSAN ELIZABETH KENT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
WENDY MARGARET EDMUNDS | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
IAN SHUTTLEWORTH | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MISTER JOHN DUNCAN ANSTEE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £2.99k | £2.85k | £2.34k | £2.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £936 | £4.18k | £770 | £1.26k | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 January 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 FEBRUARY 1973
Charitable objects
UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMSHOUSE AND SUBJECT TO AFOREMENTIONED, INCOME FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. THOMAS STANHOPE.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 22 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS, STANHOPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 FRONT STREET
STANHOPE
BISHOP AUCKLAND
CO DURHAM
DL13 2UD
- Phone:
- 01388528517
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window