THE SAINT PETER'S LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raffles and collections in the Lodge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 30 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Thomas Haines | Trustee | 07 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
norman godding | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
peter stanley dumpleton | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75 | £252 | £490 | £477 | £10.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £130 | £250 | £1.05k | £8.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 18TH MARCH 1963
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS THEIR DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN AND OF MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 St. Johns Close
Higham
ROCHESTER
ME3 7BP
- Phone:
- 07980696850
- Email:
- peter1370@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window