THE ALDEBURGH FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of the public in music and the arts at a high standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1972: Standard registration
- 15 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £4 | £1.09k | £2.71k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £501 | £721 | £1.09k | £2.72k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 06 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1948 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 15 AUGUST 1976 AND 22ND OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 02 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS AT A HIGH STANDARD, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ITS GENERALITY, THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) ORGANIZE, PROMOTE OR SUPPORT LECTURES, PERFORMANCES, DEMONSTRATIONS, EXHIBITIONS, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES, IN ALL OF WHICH THE ASSOCIATION SHALL AIM AT A HIGH STANDARD OF EXECUTION; (B) ASSIST AND SUPPORT IN THE PROMOTION AND ORGANIZATION OF FESTIVALS OF MUSIC AND ART AND IN PARTICULAR THE ALDEBURGH FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS FOR ARTISTIC AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES; (C) CO-OPERATE WITH, ASSIST AND SUPPORT ALDEBURGH MUSIC AND ITS GROUP MEMBERS FOR ARTISTIC AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1972 : Standard registration
- 15 April 2021 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window