THE ABBEYFIELD WHITEHAVEN SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Sheltered Housing for older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marian Smith | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Scott | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wilson | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mildred Josephine Linstead | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.50k | £219.48k | £195.38k | £223.92k | £278.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.52k | £219.62k | £222.87k | £231.38k | £273.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 20 JUNE 1963 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR PERSONS OF ALL CLASSES, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOUSES ETC. FOR LINELY, OLD OR HANDICAPPED PERSONS. (FOR DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION. CLAUSE 3.)
Area of benefit
WHITEHAVEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Abbeyfield Whitehaven Society L
Ltd
Johnson House
Hillcrest Avenue
WHITEHAVEN
CA28 6SU
- Phone:
- 07845736401
- Email:
- info@johnsonhouse.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window