Accounts and annual returns BRENTWOOD ASSIZE HOUSE

Charity number: 230138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 February 2025 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 October 2023 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 November 2021 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required