Financial history THE COMMUNITY OF ALL HALLOWS

Charity Number: 230143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £811.78k £454.28k £646.55k £816.77k £680.97k
Total expenditure £986.29k £395.21k £1.28m £466.06k £554.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £468.11k N/A £164.90k £148.40k £108.82k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £343.67k N/A £481.65k £508.46k £570.12k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £159.92k £2.04k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £98.59k £83.97k £58.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £986.29k N/A £1.28m £454.34k £543.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £11.72k £11.19k
Expenditure - Governance £19.52k N/A £8.18k £11.06k £10.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £633.15k N/A £674.00k £55.40k £128.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £11.72k £11.19k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0