Financial history HEDGCOCK BEQUEST

Charity Number: 230147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.99k £43.77k £38.50k £51.16k £51.73k
Total expenditure £54.87k £51.70k £43.05k £54.90k £54.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A