THE ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A general grant making charitable trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 1964: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 February 2011: Funds transferred to 1138145 THE ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION
- CARITAS (Previous name)
- MR JAMES A DE ROTHSCHILD'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £893.76k | £260.79k | £198.19k | £192.81k | £165.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £857.75k | £785.71k | £1.39m | £1.37m | £386.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 20 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 30 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 30 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 17 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 17 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 05 February 2007 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 22 December 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEEDS OF SETTLEMENT DATED THE 30TH JULY 1956 AND THE 15TH DECEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WITHIN OR OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window