RUTLAND GRANTS

Charity number: 230188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing relief to sick aged and needy people of Rutland

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,974
Total expenditure: £9,879

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE RUTLAND DISPENSARY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM SCOTT MURRAY Chair
None on record
Suzanne Johnson Trustee 04 July 2024
OAKHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
OAKHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Rutland Grants Trustee 04 July 2024
None on record
Susan Smith Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Vaughan Gilbert Trustee 08 October 2019
RUTLAND FOODBANK
Received: On time
Richard Cole Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
Dr Sarah Furness Trustee 01 May 2017
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
OAKHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
RUTLAND HISTORIC CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
ANGELA ELIZABETH HUMPHREYS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.38k £6.01k £4.36k £6.03k £9.97k
Total expenditure £7.46k £8.50k £5.19k £6.58k £9.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rutland Grants c/o Murray's Estate Agents
5 Market Street
OAKHAM
Rutland
LE15 6DY
Phone:
01572756929
Website:

No information available