THE ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC SERVICE FINANCE OFFICERS'
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants for relief of poverty when needed to surviving spouses of members or former members of the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 April 1964: Standard registration
- 28 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- A P S F O BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF LOCAL GOVERNMENT FINANCIAL OFFICERS' BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC FINANCE OFFICERS' BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £597 | £2.60k | £3.64k | £2.61k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.96k | £3.23k | £3.61k | £3.11k | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 04 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 20 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 February 2016 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 18TH APRIL 1975
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CASES OF POVERTY OR DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES, WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window