Financial history VILLAGE HALL, HUTTON-LE-HOLE

Charity number: 230327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.68k £31.24k £6.93k £7.35k £7.31k
Total expenditure £7.25k £16.08k £9.81k £11.27k £11.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.99k N/A N/A N/A