Financial history SIR E D WALKER TRUST

Charity Number: 230359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £279.98k £272.92k £268.69k £259.37k £289.22k
Total expenditure £260.41k £205.59k £204.88k £247.59k £275.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A