Financial history THE PRESS GALLERY TRUST AND OTHERS

Charity number: 230399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6 £0 £0 £9 £23
Total expenditure £6.31k £4.01k £1.60k £21.63k £851
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A