ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 230417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide almshouse accommodation for single women who by force of circumstances and resources are in need. Priority is given to women who reside in Huntingdon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £61,030
Total expenditure: £23,241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MUNICIPAL PENSION AND ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL BAKER MBE Chair
None on record
Jennifer Louise Taylor Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Michael Peter Westcott-Rudd Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Robert Richard Dearman Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Irving Trustee 30 January 2019
None on record
Rev Jon Randall Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
CLLR ANN BLACKWELL Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
LESLIE BUTTON Trustee 12 July 2012
None on record
DAPHNE PEACOCK Trustee
None on record
CHARLES FREDERICK SAUNDERS Trustee
None on record
TIM JOHNSON Trustee
None on record
ALAN BUTLER Trustee
HUNTINGDONSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE HINCHINGBROOKE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £49.90k £50.41k £52.19k £53.00k £61.03k
Total expenditure £23.77k £23.17k £22.58k £47.14k £23.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 SEPTEMBER 1899 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 27 SEPTEMBER 1907, 1 AUGUST 1916, 28 OCTOBER 1969.
Charitable objects
A. ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF HUNTINGDON FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT. B. PAYMENTS TO THE RECTOR FOR THE TIME BIENG OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HUNTINGDON AND TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST BENEDICT, HUNTINGDON.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HUNTINGDON
Registration history
  • 09 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
27 Hartford Road
HUNTINGDON
PE29 3RE
Phone:
01480385262
Website:

No information available