Trustees ETCHING HILL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 230436
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Devey | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Allen Dickinson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Burke | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY DAVIS | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Paul Johnson | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Gillian Richards | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Terrence Roy Workman | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Cotton | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.