Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - DUNCHURCH AND THURLASTON
Charity Number: 230469

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Dowse | Chair | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Webster | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Townsend | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Wells Mrs | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carla Conway Mrs | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gilbert | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Joan Haywood | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY PRATT | Trustee | 10 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAY ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.