Financial history THE ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 230538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.22m £8.49m £10.26m £12.04m £12.61m
Total expenditure £11.62m £7.97m £10.61m £13.97m £14.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.11m N/A £1.55m £1.11m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.24m £4.76m £5.39m £4.78m £4.50m
Income - Other trading activities £2.36m £205.00k £1.44m £4.02m £4.56m
Income - Charitable activities £3.50m £900.00k £2.71m £3.23m £3.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.00k £12.00k £31.00k £14.00k £53.00k
Income - Other £111.00k £2.61m £681.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £132.00k £0 £101.00k £101.00k £317.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.03m £6.33m £8.63m £9.97m £10.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.59m £1.64m £1.98m £4.00m £4.59m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £80.00k £128.00k £1.59m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £155.00k £341.00k £391.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0