ROTHWELL CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The general benefit of the inhabitants and former inhabitants of Rothwell and in particular for the provision of assistance to and relief of those so qualified who are in need by reason of age, infirmity, sickeness and economic social circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- ROTHWELL CITIZEN'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY ROFFEY | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Kate Ley | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Coyle | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Briggs-Dunmore | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN ROWLETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN WILLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT HEALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.25k | £9.53k | £7.70k | £1.25k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £2.31k | £2.01k | £1.35k | £368 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 30 March 2025 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MAY 1963 AS AMENDED 25TH JANUARY 1978
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND FORMER INHABITANTS OF ROTHWELL AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO AND RELIEF OF THOSE SO QUALIFIED WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, INFIRMITY, SICKNESS AND ECONOMIC SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
ROTHWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 COGAN CRESCENT
ROTHWELL
KETTERING
NN14 6AS
- Phone:
- 01536507368
- Email:
- pat.heald@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window