ANGLO-SWEDISH LITERARY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are the encouragement of cultural intercourse between Sweden and the British Islands through promotion and diffusion of knowledge and appreciation of the literature and art of Sweden in the British Islands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna-Marielle Stalbo Yazgan | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elin Linnea Norqvist | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lars Stefan Gullgren | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/03/2020 | 21/03/2021 | 21/03/2022 | 21/03/2023 | 21/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.88k | £6.35k | £27.25k | £25.26k | £37.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.28k | £19.92k | £25.37k | £57.73k | £19.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 March 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/3/1927
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF CULTURAL INTERCOURSE BETWEEN SWEDEN AND THE BRITISH ISLES THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECATION OF THE LITERATURE AND ART OF SWEDEN IN THE BRITISH ISLES.
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
EMBASSY OF SWEDEN
11 MONTAGU PLACE
LONDON
W1H 2AL
- Phone:
- 02079176465
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window