BORROWBY PARISH CHARITY FIELD

Charity Number: 230644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gives christmas gift to widows and widowers living within the parish. From time to time gives gifts to enhance the education of one or more young people living within the parish. A test of "need" is not made.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £150
Total expenditure: £120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARISH FIELD (Working name)
  • BORROWBY CHARITY FIELD (Previous name)
  • POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR GORDON WEIR Chair
None on record
Duncan Craig Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
MARY PECKITT Trustee
None on record
MRS CHRIS THORNTON Trustee
None on record
DAVID FRITH Trustee
THE HEBRON TRUST
Received: On time
CHAPTER HOUSE CHOIR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120 £120 £150 £150 £150
Total expenditure £200 £150 £140 £130 £120
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHERRYTREE HOUSE
BORROWBY
THIRSK
YO7 4QQ
Phone:
01845537508
Website:

No information available