Accounts and annual returns ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF MARY, DOWAGER DUCHESS OF BEAUFORT

Charity number: 230660
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required