SHOTTESBROOKE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding land for access and use of playing fields at White Waltham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 05 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARTHOLOMEW SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM BOWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 AUGUST 1963
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING: 1) PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL. 2) THE CARE AND COMFORT OF PERSONS OF LIMITED FINANCIAL MEANS OR THE AGED POOR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT, INFIRMITY OR OTHER GOOD CAUSE OF A LIKE NATURE ARE WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES.
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF SHOTTESBROOK AND WHITE WALTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARDEN HOUSE
CORNWALL GARDENS
LONDON
SW7 4BQ
- Phone:
- 07740333444
- Email:
- b@rtysmith.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window