WILLIAM CARR'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established by the Will of William Carr dated 25 August 1905 for the provision of a block of four houses as alsmshouses administered by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 15 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Coates | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Thomas Peter Bruce Yacomeni | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER SCOTT WARD | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.35k | £44.76k | £26.76k | £17.35k | £21.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.15k | £13.28k | £12.74k | £20.02k | £18.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 29/7/1910 V. UNREP. VOL. 158 AT P.350 as amended on 24 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED PERSONS, AND FOR INFIRM PERSONS OF ANY AGE, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WITH DISABILITIES OR WHO ARE UNABLE TO WORK DUE TO ILL HEALTH. TO USE ANY SURPLUS FUNDS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES, FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WESTON NEAR BATH, SOMERSET BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO USE ANY SURPLUS FUNDS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES, FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WESTON NEAR BATH, SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
WESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 BROOKFIELD PARK
BATH
BA1 4JG
- Phone:
- 01225335262
- Email:
- mail@rdowen.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window