PROVINCIAL GRAND MASTER'S (SURREY) FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes,Education and Training,Disability,Relief of Proverty,Accomodation and Housing ,Medical/Health/Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 September 1963: Standard registration
- 04 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PGM FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.42k | £451.46k | £111.70k | £201.58k | £103.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.10k | £458.50k | £151.44k | £204.69k | £111.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 22 February 2012 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 22 February 2012 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 02 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 24 August 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE LAWS
Charitable objects
PROVIDING IMMEDIATE RELIEF FOR URGENT CASES OF DISTRESS IN THE PROVINCE AND FOR ADDITIONAL RELIEF FOR CASES WHICH THE PROVINCIAL CHARITY FUND CANNOT ADEQUATELY ASSIST.
Area of benefit
SURREY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window