Trustees DARSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 230730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Jayne Robinson Trustee 05 November 2024
None on record
Rebecca Clare Ling Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
PHILIP WILLIAM ROBINSON Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
RONALD CHARLES CLARK Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
ALAN HOLLAND Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
DAVID TAYLOR Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Annie Mcphail Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Heather Ballantine Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Jill Edwards Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
MICHAEL SHIPP Trustee 12 March 2010
None on record