ROBERT STEPHENSON'S CHARITIES

Charity number: 230795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide for the maintenance of priests, support of the poor and education of children within the area specified in the Trust Deed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £154,328
Total expenditure: £164,847

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE STEPHENSON TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Francis Riddell Chair
LORD CREWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Belinda Elizabeth Hornyold-Strickland Trustee 12 January 2018
None on record
Rev Pollock Hugh Trustee 31 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £103.52k £107.50k £125.87k £164.13k £154.33k
Total expenditure £176.22k £110.99k £138.65k £136.15k £164.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE MADE 18 MARCH 1718. APPENDIX OF DOCUMENTS PAGE 21 AND SCHEME OF 30 JUNE 1863.
Charitable objects
TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME FOR EVER DISTRIBUTED UNTO AND AMONGST SUCH POOR AND INDIGENT PERSONS INHABITING THE TOWNSHIP KIRKBY KENDAL AND KIRKLAND.
Area of benefit
KIRBY KENDAL AND KIRKLAND
Registration history
  • 17 June 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
GSC Grays
Unit 9
Underley Business Centre
Kearstwick
Kirkby Lonsdale
Cumbria
Phone:
01539 722592
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available