Financial history CLAYBROOKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 230843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.11k £30.39k £28.57k £9.09k £9.88k
Total expenditure £5.53k £27.62k £18.46k £15.86k £13.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.97k £19.26k N/A N/A