BRANDON POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 230855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Housing primarily for poor widows of the parish of Brandon, Suffolk

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £26,453
Total expenditure: £18,371

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HUMPHREY HALL AND WASH CHARITIES (Working name)
  • POOR'S ESTATE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Robert Brabbs Chair 09 February 2023
None on record
Sam Skinner Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Linda Challiss Trustee 13 February 2025
BRANDON REMEMBRANCE PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
Rev Dennis Anthony Coburn Trustee 21 May 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRANDON
Received: On time
Jackie Prior Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Eric Granville Hunns Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Judith Rosemary Reddin Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.44k £21.92k £22.86k £23.34k £26.45k
Total expenditure £19.19k £15.38k £18.78k £23.32k £18.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 May 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 AUGUST 1961 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME OF 12 JANUARY 1971.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BRANDON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRANDON
Registration history
  • 22 April 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
3a Hall Close
Coulson Lane
BRANDON
IP27 0HU
Phone:
01842 812432
Website:

No information available