Trustees BRANDON POOR'S ESTATE
Charity Number: 230855

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Robert Brabbs | Chair | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Skinner | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Challiss | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Dennis Anthony Coburn | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Jackie Prior | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Granville Hunns | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rosemary Reddin | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.