Financial history THE BLACKWELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 230897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.26k £19.14k £19.40k £20.55k £16.90k
Total expenditure £44.94k £78.75k £110.52k £75.04k £104.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A