LONDON METAL EXCHANGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the Fund are to afford relief to distressed members and their families and immediate relatives dependent on them and to other such persons as are , or have been, connected with The London Metal Exchange
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
Governance
- 11 October 1963: Standard registration
- 18 January 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £8.28k | £5.41k | £1.03k | £213 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.01k | £18.71k | £31.70k | £5.72k | £64.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 October 2014 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1994 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE TO DISTRESSED MEMBERS AND TO THEIR FAMILIES AND IMMEDIATE RELATIVES DEPENDENT ON THEM AND TO OTHER SUCH PERSONS AS ARE OR HAVE BEEN CONNECTED WITH THE LONDON METAL EXCHANGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window