CATHOLIC CONCERN FOR ANIMALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CCA is active in promoting Animal Welfare and related issues throughout the Catholic world and educating all Catholics (and others) on Catholic teaching and practice on the issue of Animal welfare and compassion in line with published Catholic documents such as Pope Francis' Encyclical letter Laudato Si'. CCA does this through various means including our magazine The ARK magazine and social media
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- France
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Malta
- Poland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 09 November 1964: Standard registration
- THE ARK (Working name)
- THE CATHOLIC STUDY CIRCLE FOR ANIMAL WELFARE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CLARA MANCINI | Chair | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
William Radinson | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Henig | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Kerr | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grazia Stanek-Czerny | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Moody | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Thomas | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Gibbons | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE CASEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.16k | £154.01k | £44.56k | £46.92k | £23.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.99k | £81.03k | £92.95k | £77.55k | £83.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1963 AMENDED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1964, 26TH OCTOBER 2002 AND 25 OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RESPECT AND RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE ANIMAL CREATION WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO CATHOLIC TEACHING AND BELIEF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 CORPORATION ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM1 2AR
- Phone:
- 07817 730472
- Email:
- chrisfegancca@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window