Financial history THE SIMPSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 231030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £19.86k £15.21k £17.22k £18.60k £18.29k
Total expenditure £35.07k £34.43k £35.91k £41.40k £34.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A