MACDERMOT AND POOR'S LAND CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Owns some land and uses the rent to help releive poverty in the parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 May 1964: Standard registration
- TADMARTON CHARITIES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM JEFFREY MOODIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas David Smith | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN THERESA YEOMANS | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM FLOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN SALETHORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDERICK GORDON SALMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE PACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL PETER JUDD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £1.21k | £1.20k | £1.20k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £2.05k | £1.20k | £950 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TADMARTON
Linked charities
- 07 May 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
IVY COTTAGE
UPPER TADMARTON
BANBURY
OXFORDSHIRE
OX15 5TB
- Phone:
- 01295788104
- Email:
- deanivy@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window